U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-11464-T
  • Case Name: Mary L. Flanagan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income - Form 122A-1/Exemption Presumption of Abuse - Form 122A-1Supp]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Chapter 13 Standing Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Notice to Debtor re: Creditors Added After Commencement of Case]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Creditor List]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Verification of Creditor List]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Declaration]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Schedule(s)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Statement of Intention]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Extension of Time to File Final Report]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [30 Day Incomplete Filing - Statement of Intention]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Conversion of Case to 7 (manual)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [14 Day Incomplete Filing - Means Test]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.