U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10404-T
  • Case Name: Jacquelyn Marie Lofton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Wage Deduction Order]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Payment Advices Certification]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.