U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10883
  • Case Name: Robert John Walker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Creditors Uploaded/Schedules Filed]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Creditors Uploaded/Schedules Filed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Show Cause]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Creditors not uploaded - new case]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [(auto) Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [CCC - Credit Counseling not filed]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Required Documents not filed with Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.