U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10423-T
  • Case Name: Kayla Wanell Loving
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Wage Deduction Order]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Payment Advices Certification]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income - Form 122C-1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.