U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10421-T
  • Case Name: Raelynn Neafus
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Memorandum of Document Deficiency]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Clerk's Notice to Parties re: Address Issues]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Payment Advices Certification]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Verification of Creditor List]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.