U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10912
  • Case Name: LaTanya Monique Graham
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Dismissing Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Show Cause]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Court Notes (public)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [CCC - Credit Counseling out of date]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [CCC/FMC - Credit Counseling/Financial Management wrong name/court]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [CCC/FMC - Credit Counseling/Financial Management wrong name/court]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Pay the Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay the Filing Fees in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.