U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10896
  • Case Name: Don Earl LaPorte
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D [(auto) Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D [Employ Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D [Verify Case - Chapter 12 Individual]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D [(2) Notice Appointing Trustee & 341 Hearing (chp 7 & 12) (multi)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D [(1) Notice of Date of 341 Hearing (chp 7 & 12) (multi)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Verify Case - Chapter 12 Individual]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Required Documents not filed with Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.