U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10869
  • Case Name: Kristopher Daniel Boyd and Kelly Marie Boyd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Incorrect Forms used]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [(auto) Chapter 7 Trustee Report of No Distribution - no funds]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Incomplete PDF Image (bk)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Reaffirmation Agreement Note - Chambers]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.