U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10863
  • Case Name: Christopher R Crafts
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Notice of Case Reassignment]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Minute Order Requesting Case Reassignment]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Wrong Case/Wrong Court]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.