U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10430-T
  • Case Name: Crystal Lee Hughes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Financial Management ADI Only]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Payment Advices Certification]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice (ADI Only)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Correction to Notice of Bankruptcy Case (other)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [14 Day Incomplete Filing - Payment Advices]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.