U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-mj-00861-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bolden
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent to Appear by Video Teleconference]
  • April 02, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.