U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10439-T
  • Case Name: Steven W Nuner and Susan M Nuner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Notice - All Parties, All Creditors, US Trustee, Special Mailing Groups]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Dismissing Case - Credit Counseling]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Show Cause]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [14 Day Incomplete Filing - Payment Advices]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [14 Day Incomplete Filing - Means Test]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [2 Day Incomplete Filing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [30 Day Incomplete Filing - Statement of Intention]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [14 Day Incomplete Filing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [14 Day Incomplete Filing - Credit Counseling Issues]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Memorandum of Document Deficiency (Fees)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.