U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11005
  • Case Name: Matthew S. Tucker and Tanya M. Tucker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Notice of Intent to Pay Claims (trustee)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Pay Trustee]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Pay Trustee]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [COS - Certificate or Affidavit of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Verify Case - Chapter 13]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.