U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80269
  • Case Name: Mary Fern Stewart
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bonney, William Mark [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bonney, William Mark [Final Decree (Dismissed Case)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bonney, William Mark [Court's Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bonney, William Mark [Dismissing Case]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bonney, William Mark [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bonney, William Mark [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bonney, William Mark [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bonney, William Mark [Court's Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bonney, William Mark [Pay Filing Fee in Installments-Individuals]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.