U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10478-T
  • Case Name: Troy Dean Anson and Cynthia Lynn Anson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Extend the Automatic Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Request for Entry of Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Wage Deduction Order]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Verification of Creditor List]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Payment Advices Certification]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.