U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10486-T
  • Case Name: Ta-Tanisha Elaine Henderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Financial Management ADI Only]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Receipt of Installment Payment (Interim)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [First Installment Letter]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC - ADI Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Notice to Debtor re: Creditors Added After Commencement of Case]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Pro Se Filing Disclosure]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Payment Advices Certification]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income - Form 122A-1/Exemption Presumption of Abuse - Form 122A-1Supp]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Statement of Intention]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Petition]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Verification of Creditor List]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Memorandum of Document Deficiency]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Pro Se Filing Disclosure]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.