U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00447
  • Case Name: Sherrerd et al v. Highmark Energy Operating LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.