U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-01057
  • Case Name: OMNI Construction, LLC v. Wilson, Jr et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Continue/Reschedule Hearing or Trial]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [File Amended Answer]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.