U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10537-T
  • Case Name: Pachee Her
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Financial Management ADI Only]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Generic Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Show Cause]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income - Form 122A-1/Exemption Presumption of Abuse - Form 122A-1Supp]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Payment Advices Certification]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.