U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11152
  • Case Name: Sarah Ellen Clift
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Show Cause]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Missing Signature (bk)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.