U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11147
  • Case Name: Shamar Marie Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Pay the Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay the Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Creditors Uploaded/Schedules Filed]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [(auto) Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Creditors not uploaded - new case]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay the Filing Fees in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.