U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00071-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Garza
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 30, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Other Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.