U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11175
  • Case Name: Therese C Troy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Text Order Striking Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Dropdown Prefix Box]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [PDF/Event does not match]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.