Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:3:18-cr-00532-1
    Party Name:USA v. Saucedo-Gonzalez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment & Commitment]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Hearing]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1- Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Administrative Correction of the Record]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Management Order]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1-First / Initial Criminal Master Minutes]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?141559
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =