open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:19-61854-pcm7
    Party Name:Shawna Marie Hollis and Charlage Cantillo Walker
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [Discharging Debtor(s) - NADWA]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [xBNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.orb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?502889
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =