open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon

OREGON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:19-61853-tmr7
    Party Name:Helen Louise Cromwell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [Discharging Debtor(s) - DC7]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [xBNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.orb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?502887
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =