open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:3:19-mj-00146-1
    Party Name:USA v. Garcia-Cisneros
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:[3-Magistrate Hearing Master Minutes]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment & Commitment]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea and Sentence]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1- Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Management Order]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1-First / Initial Criminal Master Minutes]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?146550
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =