open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

OREGON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:3:18-cv-00800
    Party Name:Crockett v. H. Carranza
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Terminate Case]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Taxing Costs - Clerk]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Instructions to the Jury]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Management Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?136788
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =