open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

OREGON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:6:19-cv-01464
    Party Name:Harris v. Matco Tools Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Scheduling]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Special Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?147827
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =