open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

OREGON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01470
    Party Name:Nelle v. Legacy Health
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Scheduling]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion For Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?147857
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =