open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

OREGON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00355-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ballweber
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice by Pretrial of Compliance with Pre-Release Conditions]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1- Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue / Reset]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1-First / Initial Criminal Master Minutes]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (Arraignment)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?147156
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =