U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00822
  • Case Name: Fox v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 03, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Application for EAJA Fees]
  • January 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Declaration]
  • January 10, 2022: [Attorney Fees -EAJA ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Judgment - Terminate Case]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • October 08, 2021: [Remand]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Social Security Plaintiffs Brief]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Administrative Record - Social Security]
  • May 11, 2021: [Social Security Answer]
  • May 03, 2021: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • May 02, 2021: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - Social Security]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 16, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • December 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Attorney Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Service Papers Received]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [4 - Social Security Procedural Order FORM EVENT]
  • May 22, 2020: [Complaint - Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.