open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

OREGON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:3:20-cv-01286
    Party Name:McDonald v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Pay.gov Refund]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Summons]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Refund Request Due]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?154007
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =