U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mc-00232
  • Case Name: Rogers
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [9CONV - SEAL DOC COURT USER ONLY ROUTINE]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [9CONV - SEAL DOC COURT USER ONLY ROUTINE]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Pre-filing Review Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.