U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-mj-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowie
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [1- Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 21, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 16, 2022: [3-Magistrate Hearing Master Minutes]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 16, 2022: [5-Brady Disclosure Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 16, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed) ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.