U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen Snow
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Declaration]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue/Reset]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Violation Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 12, 2022: [Pretrial Release Violation Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [1- Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice by Pretrial of Compliance with Pre-Release Conditions]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue/Reset]
  • May 19, 2022: [Declaration]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue / Reset]
  • April 18, 2022: [Declaration]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue/Reset]
  • April 05, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 23, 2022: [3-Magistrate Hearing Master Minutes]
  • March 23, 2022: [5-Brady Disclosure Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.