U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00050-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 04, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 01, 2022: [1- Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 30, 2022: [Correction of the Record]
  • March 30, 2022: [3-Magistrate Hearing Master Minutes]
  • March 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 28, 2022: [3-Magistrate Hearing Master Minutes]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.