U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stewart
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Violation Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • September 07, 2022: [Pretrial Release Violation Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Violation Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice by Pretrial of Compliance with Pre-Release Conditions]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 14, 2022: [3-Magistrate Hearing Master Minutes]
  • April 13, 2022: [1- Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.