U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00378
  • Case Name: Peoples v. Oregon Department of Human Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Findings & Recommendation]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation Referred]
  • April 09, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 14, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 12, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Address Change]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • March 12, 2025: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.