U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01509
  • Case Name: Green v. Harley-Davidson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Service Papers Received]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Findings & Recommendation]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Objections to Findings & Recommendation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation Referred]
  • March 12, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.