U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00952
  • Case Name: ElZayn v. Trad et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Referred to District Judge]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 12, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.