U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00232
  • Case Name: Meleason v. United States of America, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition]
  • May 06, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
  • March 12, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.