U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00402
  • Case Name: Hardnett v. Charter Oak Fire Insurance/Travelers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Declination of Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Implied Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge - FORM EVENT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 19, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Declination of Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 12, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 12, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.