U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Zurich American Insurance Company et al v. Emerick Construction Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 13, 2025: [Set Aside Default Judgment]
  • May 12, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 09, 2025: [Supplement]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • May 01, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 01, 2025: [Default Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2025: [Default Entry]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 27, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: [Default Entry]
  • March 13, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.