U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-02022
  • Case Name: Jurva v. Georgia-Pacific LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Rule 16 Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Joint Status Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.