U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00432
  • Case Name: Magac v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Returned Mail]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Returned Mail]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [Clerks Notice of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw or Substitute Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Withdraw/Substitute Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.