U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00318
  • Case Name: Phillips v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Settlement Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.