U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00631
  • Case Name: Bray v. State of Oregon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.