U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00286
  • Case Name: Carroll et al v. Country Preferred Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Trial Management Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Rule 16 Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Attorney Association]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.