U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01574
  • Case Name: Century Surety Company v. Neill's Wheels, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint - Third Party]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.